EP0154052 - Safety transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP Oude Winterswijkseweg 7 NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | For all designated states N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP Oude Winterswijkseweg 7 NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoeksma, Gerben Simon Bargerkempke 5 NL-7103 DX Winterswijk / NL | [1985/37] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1985/37] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir. c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 84201873.1 | 14.12.1984 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | NL19830004414 | 22.12.1983 Original published format: NL 8304414 | [1985/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0154052 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154052 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01F31/00, H01F27/28 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
H01F27/306 (EP,US);
H01F30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/37] | Title | German: | Sicherheitstransformator | [1985/37] | English: | Safety transformer | [1985/37] | French: | Transformateur de sécurité | [1985/37] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 24.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1019714 [ ]; | GB1392495 [ ] (TAMURA SEISAKUSHO KK); | EP0041288 [ ] (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al); | DE3131105 [ ] (BRAUN AG [DE]) |