EP0150539 - Set of elements for packaging rolls of sheet-material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haendler & Natermann GmbH Am August-Natermann-Platz D-3510 Hann.-Münden / DE | [1985/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnabel, Jochen Breslauer Strasse 4 D-3402 Scheden / DE | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Rieger, Harald (DE) Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1986/28] | Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1985/32] | Fischer, Ernst, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 84201928.3 | 22.12.1984 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | DE19843403653 | 02.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3403653 | [1985/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150539 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150539 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150539 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
B65D85/67 (EP);
B65D71/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/32] | Title | German: | Bauteilesatz zum Verpacken von Folienrollen | [1985/32] | English: | Set of elements for packaging rolls of sheet-material | [1985/32] | French: | Ensemble d'éléments pour l'emballage de feuilles enroulées | [1985/32] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 10.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1988 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3371776 (VOISSEM MARVIN C); | [A]US3670878 (SEILER MARTIN W); | [A]US4033455 (ROBISON CHARLES D); | [A]US4069927 (TAYLOR CHARLES F); | [A]DE2728968 (SAINT GOBAIN) |