EP0115912 - Wall structure and method of construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1989 [1989/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vidal, Henri C. 8 Bis, Boulevard Maillot F-92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR | [1984/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/33] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | Butler, Michael John, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London, WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300139.7 | 10.01.1984 | [1984/33] | Priority number, date | US19830457160 | 11.01.1983 Original published format: US 457160 | US19830566471 | 28.12.1983 Original published format: US 566471 | [1984/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0115912 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0115912 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0115912 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/02 | [1984/33] | CPC: |
E02D29/025 (EP,US);
E02D29/0241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1984/33] | Title | German: | Mauerbauwerk und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1984/33] | English: | Wall structure and method of construction | [1984/33] | French: | Structure de murs et méthode de construction | [1984/33] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/28] | 28.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2441216 (KAEPPLER KLAUS DIPL ING); | [A]US4125970 (VIDAL HENRI C); | [A]DE3103849 (ZUEBLIN AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0058731 |