EP0119678 - Tone generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allan, Paul 37 Charnwood Lane Arnold Nottingham NG5 6PE / GB | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Sorenti, Gino Intellectual Property Department The Plessey Company plc 2-60 Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/28] | Sorenti, Gino Intellectual Property Department The Plessey Company plc 2-60 Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | ||
Former [1985/18] | Field, Howard John The Plessey Company plc Beeston Nottingham, NG9 1LA / GB | ||
Former [1984/39] | Goodman, Christopher The Plessey Company plc Beeston Nottingham NG9 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300152.0 | 11.01.1984 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | GB19830001324 | 18.01.1983 Original published format: GB 8301324 | [1984/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119678 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04Q1/448 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
H04Q1/4575 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | Tongenerator | [1984/39] | English: | Tone generator | [1984/39] | French: | Générateur de tonalité | [1984/39] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 05.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/16] | 19.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/23] | 09.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2855151 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | FR2459597 [ ] (CONSTR TELEPHONIQUES); | DE2309789 [ ] (MARCONI CO LTD); | DE3222314 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | FR2529426 [ ] (THOMSON CSF MAT TEL [FR]) |