EP0117619 - A tap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1987 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1987 [1987/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WADDINGTON & DUVAL LIMITED Brewhouse Street Putney London SW15 2NB / GB | [1984/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucking, Anthony James Flat 20 Broad Court Bow Street London, WC2B 5QU / GB | [1984/36] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Norman House, 105-109 Strand London, WC2R OAE / GB | [1984/36] | Application number, filing date | 84300412.8 | 24.01.1984 | [1984/36] | Priority number, date | GB19830004244 | 16.02.1983 Original published format: GB 8304244 | [1984/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0117619 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0117619 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B67D3/04 | [1984/36] | CPC: |
B67D3/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1984/36] | Title | German: | Zapfhahn | [1984/36] | English: | A tap | [1984/36] | French: | Robinet | [1984/36] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/47] | 27.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1244121 [ ] (USINES D EMBALLAGES VAN LEER); | DE562470 [ ] (GUSTAV HUBBE G W FARENHOLTZ G); | GB1089632 [ ] (SCHOLLE CONTAINER CORP); | US3128925 [ ] |