EP0124192 - Ink for thermal ink jet printers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1984/45] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, John David 1359 Latham Street Mountain View California 94041 / US | 02 /
Vaught, John L. 1549 Channing Avenue Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | Schulte, Knud Hewlett-Packard GmbH Europ. Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Herrenberger Strasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | Schulte, Knud, Dipl.-Ing. Hewlett-Packard GmbH Europ. Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Herrenberger Strasse 130 D-71034 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [1984/45] | Oliver, Peter Anthony Hewlett-Packard Limited Nine Mile Ride Easthampstead Wokingham, Berkshire RG11 3LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300474.8 | 26.01.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | US19830490682 | 02.05.1983 Original published format: US 490682 | [1984/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0124192 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0124192 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
C09D11/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/45] | Title | German: | Tinte für thermische Strahldruckvorrichtung | [1984/45] | English: | Ink for thermal ink jet printers | [1984/45] | French: | Encre pour imprimeuse thermique à jets d'encre | [1984/45] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 31.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/45] | 20.02.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3018852 |