EP0120562 - Elastomer, polypropylene blends for optically clear products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.1984 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hazelton, Donald Ross 89 Glenmere Drive Chatham New Jersey / US | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.Po. Box 1 Abingdon, Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.Po. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300497.9 | 26.01.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | US19830461510 | 27.01.1983 Original published format: US 461510 | [1984/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0120562 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/40] | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/16, C08L23/10, // (C08L23/10, 23:16),(C08L23/16, 23:10) | [1984/40] | CPC: |
C08L23/14 (EP);
C08L23/10 (EP);
C08L23/142 (EP);
C08L23/16 (EP);
C08L2205/02 (EP);
C08L23/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L23/14, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L23/16, C08L2666/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/40] | Title | German: | Optisch klare elastomere Mischung aus Polypropylen | [1984/40] | English: | Elastomer, polypropylene blends for optically clear products | [1984/40] | French: | Mélanges élastomères transparents de polypropylène | [1984/40] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/40] | 21.10.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |