EP0118997 - Direct relay equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguchi, Yoshifumi 4-21-24, Shakujiimachi Nerima-ku Tokyo 177 / JP | 02 /
Endoh, Hiroyuki 1-24-9, Fujigaoka Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 277 / JP | 03 /
Ono, Kouichi 1-40-7, Shinishikawa Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | [1984/38] | Representative(s) | George, Sidney Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HN / GB | [1984/38] | Application number, filing date | 84300735.2 | 06.02.1984 | [1984/38] | Priority number, date | JP19830020876 | 10.02.1983 Original published format: JP 2087683 | [1984/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0118997 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0118997 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118997 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/155 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
H04B7/15528 (EP,US);
H04B7/15 (EP,US);
H04B7/155 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/38] | Title | German: | Geradeausverstärker-Relaisstation | [1984/38] | English: | Direct relay equipment | [1984/38] | French: | Station relais à transformation directe | [1984/38] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/04] | 27.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP55026737 ; | [A]FR2057218 (THOMSON CSF); | [A]DE3004019 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) | [Y] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol.4, No. 56, (E-8) (538), April 25, 1980. & JP-A-55 026 737 (FUJITSU) 26-02-1980, & JP55026737 A 00000000 | [Y] - ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 43, No. 519, May 1971, pages 41-43, LONDON (GB) B. OLIVER: "Hybrid i.cs a major factor in microwave component development". | [Y] - 8th EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, 4-8 September 1978, PARIS (FR) pages 620-625, Conference proceedings, SEVEN OAKS, KENT (GB) D. ROUFFET et al.: "Study of a two carriers solid state straight through repeater at 7.5 GHz". | [A] - INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, SEATLE (US), 11-13 June 1973, NEW YORK (US) pages 28-20 -28-24 A.WALKER et al.: "Digital modulation techniques". |