EP0127925 - Method for labelling phagocytic cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1992 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESTAR, INC. 650 Cliffside Drive San Dimas California 91773 / US | For all designated states City of Hope 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states VESTAR, INC. 650 Cliffside Drive San Dimas California 91773 / US | ||
For all designated states CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte California 91010-0269 / US | |||
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states VESTAR, INC. 650 Cliffside Drive San Dimas California 91773 / US | ||
For all designated states CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte California 91010-0269 / US | |||
Former [1984/50] | For all designated states VESTAR RESEARCH INC. 939, East Walnut Avenue Pasadena California 91106 / US | ||
For all designated states CITY OF HOPE NATIONAL MEDICAL CENTER 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte California 91010-0269 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gamble, Ronald Carl 3390 Ellington Villa Altadena, CA 91001 / US | 02 /
Tin, George Wing-Yiu 431 East Sandra Arcadia, CA 91006 / US | 03 /
Williams, Lawrence Ernest 224 Huntington Drive San Dimas, CA 91773 / US | [1992/01] |
Former [1984/50] | 01 /
Gamble, Ronald Carl 3390 Ellington Villa Altadena California 91001 / US | ||
02 /
Tin, George Wing-Yiu 431 East Sandra Arcadia California 91006 / US | |||
03 /
Williams, Lawrence Ernest 224 Huntington Drive San Dimas California 91773 / US | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84300854.1 | 10.02.1984 | [1984/50] | Priority number, date | US19830465502 | 10.02.1983 Original published format: US 465502 | [1984/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127925 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127925 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127925 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/02 | [1984/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
A61K51/1203 (EP,US);
A61K51/1227 (EP,US);
A61K51/1234 (EP,US);
A61K2123/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Markierung von phagozytischen Zellen | [1984/50] | English: | Method for labelling phagocytic cells | [1984/50] | French: | Méthode de marquage de cellules phagocytaires | [1984/50] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/48] | 11.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 30.11.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52] | Request for further processing for: | 30.01.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 9, August 31, 1981, ref.no. 77575k; Columbus, Ohio, (US) R.N. ROWLAND et al: "Uptake of free and liposome-entrapped iodine-125-labeled PVP by rat intestinal sacs in vitro: Evidence for endocytosis."; & Biosci. Rep. 1981, 1(5), 399-406 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 77, no. 1, July 3, 1972, page 195, ref.no. 1986c; Columbus, Ohio, (US) J. HAWIGER et al: "Activation of lysosomal enzymes in polymorphonuclear leukocytic granules. Role of phospholipid-protein interaction."; & Yale J. BIOL. MED. 1972, 45(1), 42-8 | [Y] - JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, vol. 17, no. 6, June 1976, pages 488-492. J.G. McAFEE et al: " Survey of radioactive agents for in vitro labeling of phagocytic leukocytes. II. Particles." | [Y] - JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, vol. 17, no. 6, June 1976, pages 480-487. J.G. McAFREE et al: " Survey of radioactive agents for in vitro labeling of phagocytic leukocytes. I. Soluble agents." | Examination | - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, US, vol. 78; pp. 2033-2037 | - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, US, vol. 77; pp. 4430-4434 | - Science Vol. 207, pp. 4428 ff. |