EP0117138 - Apparatus for applying additives to a filter tow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 403 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 403 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | ||
Former [1984/35] | For all designated states R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY 403 North Main Street Winston-Salem North Carolina 27102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pryor, James Willard 1703 Briar Lake Road Winston-Salem North Carolina / US | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | Leale, Robin George, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301045.5 | 17.02.1984 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | US19830468011 | 18.02.1983 Original published format: US 468011 | [1984/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0117138 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0117138 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/02 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
A24D3/022 (EP,US);
D06B3/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/35] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Auftragen von Zusätzen auf ein Filtertau | [1984/35] | English: | Apparatus for applying additives to a filter tow | [1984/35] | French: | Appareil pour appliquer des additifs sur un cordon filtrant | [1984/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 15.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/26] | 28.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/34] | 16.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3282768 (CAINES JAMES F, et al); | [AD]US3099594 (CAINES JAMES F, et al); | [AD]US2966198 (ROWLAND WYLDE JOSEPH); | [AD]US3297506 (PANNILL JR JAMES K, et al); | [AD]US3262181 (HAWKINS ROY E, et al); | [AD]US3050430 (PAUL GALLAGHER) |