EP0117710 - Roll bonded tubing for brazed articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.1985 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1984/36] | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fulton, Clarence William 216 Overton Place Oakville Ontario / CA | [1984/36] | Representative(s) | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/36] | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301113.1 | 21.02.1984 | [1984/36] | Priority number, date | CA19830422469 | 25.02.1983 Original published format: CA 422469 | [1984/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0117710 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0117710 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B21D53/04 | [1984/36] | CPC: |
B21D53/045 (EP);
B23K20/04 (KR);
F28F21/084 (EP);
F28F3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1984/36] | Title | German: | Walzplattierter Rohrstrang aus mit Hartlot bedecktem Streifenmaterial | [1984/36] | English: | Roll bonded tubing for brazed articles | [1984/36] | French: | Dispositif de tubes obtenu par placage par laminage de feuillard couvert de métal d'apport de brasage fort | [1984/36] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/07] | 03.09.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH384008 (OLIN MATHIESON [US]); | [AD]US2690002 (GRENELL LELAND H); | [AD]US3839975 (TRANEL L); | [A]US2906006 (MILTON NEEL ROBERT); | [A]GB2029284 (OLIN CORP); | [A]DE2123628 |