EP0121326 - Alkanediyl bridged benzimidazolo monomethine cyanine dyes, processes for their preparation, and photographic emulsions and elements containing such dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1990 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gilbert, David Philip 797 Lauren Ct. Webster New York 14580 / US | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Baron, Paul Alexander Clifford, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | Baron, Paul Alexander Clifford, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301326.9 | 01.03.1984 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | US19830471615 | 03.03.1983 Original published format: US 471615 | [1984/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121326 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121326 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121326 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C09B23/04, G03C1/26 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
G03C1/12 (EP,US);
C09B23/00 (EP,US);
C09B23/04 (EP,US);
G03C1/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/41] | Title | German: | Benzimidazol-Monomethin-Cyanin-Farbstoffe mit Alkandiylbrücke, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und fotographische Emulsionen und Materialien welche diese Farbstoffe enthalten | [1984/41] | English: | Alkanediyl bridged benzimidazolo monomethine cyanine dyes, processes for their preparation, and photographic emulsions and elements containing such dyes | [1984/41] | French: | Colorants benzimidazol-monométhiniques de cyanine avec pont alkanediylique, procédé pour leur préparation et émulsions photographiques et matériaux contenant de tels colorants | [1984/41] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2479152 (BROOKER LESLIE G S); | [AD]GB1096104 (FERRANIA SPA) |