EP0123391 - Control system for manipulation apparatus with initializing stabilization and inertia scaling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1989 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIMATION INC. Shelter Rock Lane Danbury Connecticut 06810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | For all designated states UNIMATION INC. Shelter Rock Lane Danbury Connecticut 06810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunne, Maurice J. R3 Taunton Lake Road Newtown, Connecticut 06470 / US | [1984/44] | Representative(s) | Orr, William McLean, et al Haseltine Lake & Co Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | Orr, William McLean, et al Haseltine Lake & Co Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301423.4 | 05.03.1984 | [1984/44] | Priority number, date | US19830478646 | 25.03.1983 Original published format: US 478646 | [1984/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0123391 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123391 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B25J13/00, G05B19/42 | [1984/44] | CPC: |
G05B19/237 (EP,US);
B25J9/1638 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33337 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37357 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37388 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39178 (EP,US);
G05B2219/41309 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/44] | Title | German: | Steuerungssystem für einen Manipulator mit initialisierter Stabilisierung und Trägheitsuntersetzung | [1984/44] | English: | Control system for manipulation apparatus with initializing stabilization and inertia scaling | [1984/44] | French: | Système de contrôle pour appareil de manipulateur à stabilisation amorcée et inertie de multiplicateur | [1984/44] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 11.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2457801 ; | [A]DE2656433 ; | [A]GB2102590 (CUSTOM MICRODESIGN [GB]); | [A]GB1423547 (VER FLUGTECHNISCHE WERKE); | [A]US4367532 (CRUM GERALD W, et al); | [AD]US3661051 (DUNNE MAURICE J, et al); | [AD]US4086522 (ENGELBERGER JOSEPH F, et al); | [AD]US4338672 (PERZLEY WILLIAM, et al); | [AD]US4362978 (POLLARD BRIAN W, et al) | Examination | US4132937 |