EP0122013 - Polymeric additives for water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALGON CORPORATION Route 60-Campbell's Run Road Robinson Township Pennsylvania 15205 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states CALGON CORPORATION Route 60-Campbell's Run Road Robinson Township Pennsylvania 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Persinski, Leonard J. 340 Orchard Spring Road Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15226 / US | 02 /
Walker, Jerry L. 210 Norman Drive Coraopolis Pennsylvania 15108 / US | 03 /
Boffardi, Bennett P. 5723 Glen Hill Drive Bethel Park Pennsylvania 15102 / US | [1984/42] | Representative(s) | Crampton, Keith John Allen, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1984/42] | Application number, filing date | 84301450.7 | 05.03.1984 | [1984/42] | Priority number, date | US19830472808 | 07.03.1983 Original published format: US 472808 | US19840578331 | 14.02.1984 Original published format: US 578331 | [1984/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0122013 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0122013 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C02F5/08, C23F11/00 | [1984/42] | CPC: |
C02F5/10 (EP);
C02F5/12 (EP);
C02F5/14 (EP);
C23F11/08 (EP);
C23F11/10 (EP);
C23F11/173 (EP);
F02B2075/027 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/42] | Title | German: | Polymere Zusatzstoffe für Wasser | [1984/42] | English: | Polymeric additives for water | [1984/42] | French: | Additifs polymères pour l'eau | [1984/42] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/19] | 09.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP86110150.9 / EP0210590 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.1989
08.11.1989
ADMISSIBLE Metallgesellschaft AG, Frankfurt/M -ZA Recht und Patente- Reuterweg 14 Postfach 10 15 01 D-60271 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02
21.09.1989
08.11.1989
ADMISSIBLE BetzDearborn, Inc. 4636 Somerton Road, PO Box 2002 Trevose, PA 19053-6783 / US Opponent's representative Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.1989
08.11.1989
ADMISSIBLE Metallgesellschaft AG, Frankfurt/M -ZA Recht und Patente- Reuterweg 14 Postfach 10 15 01 D-60271 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
21.09.1989
08.11.1989
ADMISSIBLE BetzDearborn, Inc. 4636 Somerton Road, PO Box 2002 Trevose, PA 19053-6783 / US Opponent's representative Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | |||
Former [1989/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.1989
08.11.1989
ADMISSIBLE Metallgesellschaft AG, Frankfurt/M -ZA Recht und Patente- Reuterweg 14 Postfach 10 15 01 D-60271 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
21.09.1989
08.11.1989
ADMISSIBLE W.R. Grace & Co. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036 / US Opponent's representative Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | |||
Former [1989/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.1989
08.11.1989
ADMISSIBLE Metallgesellschaft AG, Frankfurt/M -ZA Recht und Patente- Reuterweg 14 Postfach 10 15 01 D-60271 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 10.11.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.10.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 26.10.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/51] | Appeal following opposition | 08.04.1998 | Appeal received No. T0361/98 | 08.04.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.10.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 24.01.1992 | Appeal received No. T0132/92 | 31.03.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.10.1995 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1995/42] | 26.02.1996 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1996/09] | 06.08.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 11.09.2001 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2001/37] | 11.09.2001 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/37] | 06.08.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.08.1996 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.03.1989 | SE | 06.03.1995 | CH | 31.03.1995 | LI | 31.03.1995 | [1999/52] |
Former [1996/18] | SE | 06.03.1995 | |
CH | 31.03.1995 | ||
LI | 31.03.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 06.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2511668 ; | [X]US3879288 ; | [X]US4048066 ; | [X]GB2054548 ; | [X]US4166041 ; | [X]EP0062718 ; | [XP]FR2515631 | Examination | US3578589 | US4176059 |