EP0119809 - Cover assembly for optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.1989 [1989/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davies, David H. Minnesota Mining and Man. Co. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | 02 /
Evanicky, Daniel E. Minnesota Mining and Man. Co. 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133 / US | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84301657.7 | 12.03.1984 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | US19830474877 | 14.03.1983 Original published format: US 474877 | [1984/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119809 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0119809 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
G11B7/24097 (EP,US);
G11B7/254 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | Zusammengesetzte Hülle für optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [1984/39] | English: | Cover assembly for optical recording medium | [1984/39] | French: | Assemblage de housse pour support optique d'enregistrement | [1984/39] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/17] | 23.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0086065 [ ] (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | EP0090695 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | US4331966 [ ] (MOE ERIK); | US4074282 [ ] (BALAS JR CHARLES, et al); | US4308545 [ ] (LEHUREAU JEAN-CLAUDE, et al) |