EP0123404 - Footrest assembly for recliner chairs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1988 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARMA CORPORATION P.O. Box 729 Denton, NC 27239 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | For all designated states PARMA CORPORATION P.O. Box 728 Denton, NC 27239 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rogers, Walter Clark, Jr. P.O. Box 685 Denton North Carolina 27239 / US | [1984/44] | Representative(s) | Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | Ranson, Arthur Terence, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 84301757.5 | 15.03.1984 | [1984/44] | Priority number, date | US19830478228 | 24.03.1983 Original published format: US 478228 | [1984/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0123404 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123404 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/034 | [1984/44] | CPC: |
A47C7/506 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1984/44] | Title | German: | Fussstütze für einen verstellbaren Lehnstuhl | [1984/44] | English: | Footrest assembly for recliner chairs | [1984/44] | French: | Appui-pieds pour un fauteuil inclinable | [1984/44] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/21] | 28.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.06.1987 | [1989/18] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB888706 (ANTON LORENZ); | [Y]US3206775 (FILSON GEORGE W); | [A]DE1529513 (FLETCHER PETER S); | [A]GB843639 (PETER STEWART FLETCHER); | [A]US2869616 (BELISLE ADELARD J) |