EP0123434 - Improvements in the production of edible protein containing substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1989 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RANKS HOVIS McDOUGALL PLC RHM Centre P.O. Box 178 67 Alma Road Windsor Berkshire SL4 3ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | For all designated states RANKS HOVIS McDOUGALL PLC RHM Centre P.O. Box 178 67 Alma Road Windsor Berkshire SL4 3ST / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marsh, Robert Anthony 2 Stockwell Furlong Haddenham Bucks HP17 8HD / GB | [1984/44] | Representative(s) | Turner, Paul Malcolm, et al URQUHART DYKES & LORD 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | [1984/44] | Application number, filing date | 84301970.4 | 23.03.1984 | [1984/44] | Priority number, date | GB19830008162 | 24.03.1983 Original published format: GB 8308162 | [1984/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0123434 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0123434 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0123434 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/14, // (C12N1/14, C12R1:77) | [1984/44] | CPC: |
C12N1/14 (EP,US);
Y10S435/929 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/44] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen in der Herstellung von essbaren Protein-enthaltenden Substanzen | [1989/05] | English: | Improvements in the production of edible protein containing substances | [1984/44] | French: | Améliorations pour la production de substances contenant des protéines comestibles | [1989/05] |
Former [1984/44] | Herstellung von essbaren Protein-enthaltenden Substanzen | ||
Former [1984/44] | Production de substances contenant des protéines comestibles | Examination procedure | 18.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 19.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.04.1984 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   16.05.1984 | 23.04.1984 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   16.05.1984 | 23.04.1984 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   16.05.1984 | 23.04.1984 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   16.05.1984 | 23.04.1984 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   16.05.1984 | 23.04.1984 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   16.05.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR869392 (HENKEL & CIE G M B H SOC); | [A]US4073956 (YATES RICHARD ALAN); | [A]US4163692 (YATES RICHARD A [US]); | [AD]US4294929 (SOLOMONS GERALD L, et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 19, 12th May 1980, page 290, no. 160287b, Columbus, Ohio, US; J.H.WALSH: "Effect of nutritional factors and carbon dioxide on growth of Fusarium moniliforme and other fungi in reduced oxygen concentrations" & TRANS. BR. MYCOL. SOC. 1980, 74(1), 111-18 |