EP0121392 - Method and means for peaking or peak power shaving [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.01.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ormat Turbines (1965) Ltd. P.O. Box 68 Yavne 70650 / IL | [1984/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bronicki, Lucien Yehuda P.O. Box 68 Yavne 70650 / IL | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Godwin, Edgar James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1984/41] | Lee, Philip Graham MARKS & CLERK 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302022.3 | 26.03.1984 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | US19830479008 | 25.03.1983 Original published format: US 479008 | [1984/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121392 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121392 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F01K25/08 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
F01K23/14 (EP,US);
F01K25/08 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
Y02E20/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1984/41] | Title | German: | Methode und Vorrichtungen für Spitzenleistung oder für Spitzenleistungverminderung | [1984/41] | English: | Method and means for peaking or peak power shaving | [1984/41] | French: | Méthode et moyens pour une production de pointe ou pour diminuer la production de pointe | [1984/41] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/23] | 09.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1992/09] | 21.10.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/09] | Appeal following examination | 03.03.1989 | Appeal received No. T0363/89 | 05.05.1989 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.06.1990 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1990/22] | 02.08.1990 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1990/31] | 21.10.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 21.10.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.1991 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1290002 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]US3350876 (JOHNSON ROY W P); | [A]GB1159090 (WARNOWWERFT WARNEMUENDE VEB [DE]); | [A]DE2544179 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]FR2296295 (SEMT [FR]) |