EP0124257 - An all grain enzyme-saccharified cereal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.07.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL FOODS CORPORATION 250 North Street White Plains, N.Y. 10625 / US | [1984/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Von Fulger, Charles P.O. Box 493 Millwood New York 10546 / US | 02 /
Gum, Ernest Kemp RFD 2 130 Granit Springs New York 10527 / US | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84302103.1 | 28.03.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | US19830480986 | 31.03.1983 Original published format: US 480986 | [1984/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0124257 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/10 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
A23L7/135 (EP,US);
A23L7/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/45] | Title | German: | Enzymgezuckerte Vollkorn-Frühstückskost | [1984/45] | English: | An all grain enzyme-saccharified cereal | [1984/45] | French: | Nourriture de petit déjeuner à grain complet saccharifiée enzymatiquement | [1984/45] | File destroyed: | 08.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/16] | 11.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.03.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1988/34] | 25.03.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2289416 (FINE MORRIS S, et al); | [A]DE2844896 (LYCKEBY STAERKELSEFOERAEDLING); | [A]DE2757036 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH); | [AP]EP0078782 (PLAVIA MASKIN AB [SE]) |