EP0126533 - Test instrument with flexibly connected head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED 1600 Dorchester Boulevard West Montreal Quebec H3H 1R1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED 1600 Dorchester Boulevard West Montreal Quebec H3H 1R1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Austin, Hollis Brown 1603 Northbrook Drive Manchester New Hampshire 03102 / US | [1984/48] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC2A 1AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302246.8 | 02.04.1984 | [1984/48] | Priority number, date | US19830487058 | 21.04.1983 Original published format: US 487058 | [1984/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0126533 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126533 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/165, G01R1/073, H01R29/00 | [1984/48] | CPC: |
H04M3/308 (EP,US);
H04M1/24 (KR);
G01R1/0416 (EP,US);
G01R19/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1984/48] | Title | German: | Testinstrument mit flexibel verbundenem Testkopf | [1984/48] | English: | Test instrument with flexibly connected head | [1984/48] | French: | Instrument d'essai avec une tête d'essai assemblée flexible | [1984/48] | File destroyed: | 17.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 15.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2170131 (DOREMUS CORNELIUS W); | [A]US3562643 (SMITH JAMES P); | [A]GB1283012 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) |