EP0124299 - Hydraulic gerotor motor and parking brake for use therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.1990 [1990/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION 100 Erieview Plaza Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION 100 Erieview Plaza Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenker, Wayne Bernard 1510 Excelsior Avenue Hopkins Minnesota 55343 / US | [1984/45] | Representative(s) | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/45] | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302283.1 | 03.04.1984 | [1984/45] | Priority number, date | US19830481972 | 04.04.1983 Original published format: US 481972 | [1984/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0124299 | Date: | 07.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0124299 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0124299 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/10 | [1984/45] | CPC: |
F04C14/06 (EP);
F04C15/0061 (EP);
F04C15/0084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/45] | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Gerotor-Motor und Feststellbremse zum Gebrauch darin | [1984/45] | English: | Hydraulic gerotor motor and parking brake for use therein | [1984/45] | French: | Moteur hydraulique avec engrenage intérieur et frein de stationnement y utilisé | [1984/45] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 06.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3616882 ; | [A]GB2033479 ; | [A]DE2224484 ; | [AD]US4343600 ; | [AD]US3572983 |