EP0127935 - Method of and apparatus for bending and straightening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/50] | Bending and straightening apparatus | ||
[1987/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Permanent Way Equipment Company Limited Giltway Giltbrook Nottingham, NG6 2GQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | For all designated states The Permanent Way Equipment Company Limited Giltway Giltbrook Nottingham, NG6 2GQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hudson, Michael John 3 Fountains Close Abbey Park West Bridgford Nottingham / GB | 02 /
Sinclair, John Charles 9 Bargate Lane Willington Derbyshire / GB | [1984/50] | Representative(s) | Coxon, Philip, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | Coxon, Philip, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302592.5 | 17.04.1984 | [1984/50] | Priority number, date | GB19830011095 | 23.04.1983 Original published format: GB 8311095 | GB19830011111 | 23.04.1983 Original published format: GB 8311111 | [1984/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0127935 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127935 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E01B31/08 | [1984/50] | CPC: |
E01B31/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/50] | Title | German: | Biege- und Richtverfahren sowie Biege- und Richtvorrichtung | [1987/04] | English: | Method of and apparatus for bending and straightening | [1987/04] | French: | Procédé et appareil de cintrage et de redressage | [1987/04] |
Former [1984/50] | Biege- und Richtvorrichtung | ||
Former [1984/50] | Bending and straightening apparatus | ||
Former [1984/50] | Appareil de cintrage et de redressage | Examination procedure | 01.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/25] | 21.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.04.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1468972 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ); | [A]DE10712 ; | [A]US2180157 (LOFTUS JOHN T); | [A]DE437329 (MARTIN FRIEDRICH) |