EP0160753 - Electrotherapy acupuncture apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1989 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL MEDICAL MACHINES, INC. 1500 Bank of Orleans Building New Orleans Louisiana 70112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/46] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL MEDICAL MACHINES, INC. 1500 Bank of Orleans Building New Orleans Louisiana 70112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pomeranz, Bruce 15 Governor's Road Rosedale Ontario M4W 2E9 / CA | 02 /
Salansky, Norman 6, Hearthstone Crescent Willowdale Ontario M2R 1G3 / CA | [1986/17] |
Former [1985/46] | 01 /
Pomeranz, Bruce 15 Governor's Road Rosedale Ontario M4W 2E9 / CA | ||
02 /
Solansky, Norman 6, Hearthstone Crescent Willowdale Ontario M2R 1G3 / CA | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1985/46] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302741.8 | 24.04.1984 | [1985/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0160753 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0160753 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/32, A61H39/00, A61N1/34 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
A61N1/36021 (EP,US);
A61N1/326 (EP,US);
Y10S128/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1985/46] | Title | German: | Elektrotherapeutisches Akupunktur-Gerät und -Verfahren | [1985/46] | English: | Electrotherapy acupuncture apparatus and method | [1985/46] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'acupuncture électrothérapeutique | [1985/46] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 24.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4431000 (BUTLER RUSSELL B [US], et al); | [Y]FR2430239 (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL]); | [A]EP0057561 (BIO MEDICAL RES LTD [IE]); | [A]FR2528709 (BIOSTIM INC [US]); | [A]US3012271 (MORSE ROY E); | [E]EP0111229 (NEUROTRONIC LTD [CA]) |