EP0127339 - Brake system incorporating a stepping motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.1989 [1989/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE AND SIGNAL COMPANY LIMITED Pew Hill Chippenham Wiltshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE AND SIGNAL COMPANY LIMITED Pew Hill Chippenham Wiltshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Washbourn, Jack 9 Boundary Close Bradenstoke Chippenham Wiltshire / GB | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Bird, Vivian John, et al PAGE & CO. Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol, BS1 6PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | Bird, Vivian John, et al PAGE & CO. Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol, BS1 6PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84302942.2 | 02.05.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | GB19830012025 | 03.05.1983 Original published format: GB 8312025 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127339 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127339 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127339 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/68 | [1984/49] | CPC: |
B60T13/68 (EP,US);
B60T13/665 (EP,US);
B60T8/1893 (EP,US);
B60T8/266 (EP,US);
B60T8/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/49] | Title | German: | Bremssystem mit Schrittmotor | [1984/49] | English: | Brake system incorporating a stepping motor | [1984/49] | French: | Système de freinage comportant un moteur pas à pas | [1984/49] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/26] | 05.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.06.1984 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   23.07.1984 | 02.06.1984 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   23.07.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.03.1988 | [1989/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB919519 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL); | [Y]FR1562362 ; | [A]US3528709 (ENGLE THOMAS H); | [A]FR2127957 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL); | [A]US3814483 (COINER R, et al); | [A]US4021079 (BOHUSCH GLEN O); | [A]FR2358299 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4078628 (REICHENBERGER ANTON J); | [Y]GB2016103 (GIRLING LTD); | [A]EP0032435 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) |