EP0132023 - Change gear planetary transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.1986 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION 100 Erieview Plaza Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION 100 Erieview Plaza Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harper, Joseph Frederick Brian 7, Alcester Road Sale Cheshire M33 GW / GB | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303183.2 | 11.05.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | GB19830013910 | 19.05.1983 Original published format: GB 8313910 | [1985/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132023 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132023 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/54, F16H3/78 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
F16H3/78 (EP,US);
F16H3/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/04] | F16H3/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Planetenwechselgetriebe | [1985/04] | English: | Change gear planetary transmission | [1985/04] | French: | Transmission planétaire à changement de vitesses | [1985/04] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 26.07.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD28099 ; | [X]US2331684 (HENNINGSEN JOHN E); | [X]DE1750546 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN); | [X]FR2185479 (DESOUTTER BROTHERS LTD [GB]); | [XP]FR2528141 (VOLVO AB [SE]) |