EP0125910 - Process for production of 4-methyl-1-pentene polymer or copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1987 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1987 [1987/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/47] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kashiwa, Norio 2-9, Muronoki-cho, 1-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Fukui, Kunisuke 2-5, Misono 1-chome Ohtake-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1984/47] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1984/47] | Application number, filing date | 84303227.7 | 11.05.1984 | [1984/47] | Priority number, date | JP19830080936 | 11.05.1983 Original published format: JP 8093683 | [1984/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0125910 | Date: | 21.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0125910 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/14, C08F4/64 | [1984/47] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
Y10S526/904 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 4-Methyl-1-penten-Polymeren oder -Copolymeren | [1986/41] | English: | Process for production of 4-methyl-1-pentene polymer or copolymer | [1984/47] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polymères de 4-méthyl-1-pentène ou de copolymères | [1984/47] |
Former [1984/47] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 4-Methyl-1 Penten-Polymeren oder Copolymeren | Examination procedure | 15.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 10.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0013837 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [AD]EP0045977 |