EP0162155 - Production of titanium metal sponge and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metals Production Research, Inc. 17 Country Village Way Media Pennsylvania / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/48] | For all designated states Metals Production Research, Inc. 17 Country Village Way Media Pennsylvania / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murphy, Andrew H. 4286 22nd Place S.W. Naples Florida 33940 / US | [1985/48] | Representative(s) | Nettleton, John Victor, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Nettleton, John Victor, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1985/48] | Spencer, Graham Easdale A.A. Thornton & CO Northumberland House 303-306, High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303238.4 | 14.05.1984 | [1985/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0162155 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162155 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C22B34/12 | [1985/48] | CPC: |
C25C3/04 (EP,US);
C22B34/1222 (EP,US);
C22B34/1272 (EP,US);
C22B34/129 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/48] | Title | German: | Herstellung von metallischen Titan in Form von Schwamm und Vorrichtung dafür | [1985/48] | English: | Production of titanium metal sponge and apparatus therefor | [1985/48] | French: | Production d'éponge de titane métallique et appareillage à cet effet | [1985/48] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 24.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1082068 (TITAN GMBH); | [X]GB638840 (BRITISH ALUMINIUM CO LTD, et al); | [A]US3847596 (HOLLAND G, et al); | [A]US3067112 (GOTTFRIED TRUMPLER); | [A]US3021268 (EGAMI ICHIRO); | [A]US2921890 (RANEY BEN B); | [A]FR1192208 (ICI LTD) |