EP0127385 - Improvements in or relating to the production of polymeric foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unifoam AG Kirchweg 54 CH-8750 Glarus / CH | [1984/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vreenegoor, Nicholas Cornelius Kortenaerlaan 11 Bennebroek / NL | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Simpson, Ronald Duncan Innes, et al A.A.Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WCIV 7LE / GB | [1989/15] |
Former [1984/49] | Barrett, James William A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303325.9 | 16.05.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | GB19830014010 | 20.05.1983 Original published format: GB 8314010 | GB19830032445 | 06.12.1983 Original published format: GB 8332445 | [1984/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0127385 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0127385 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127385 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B29C39/00, B29K105/04 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
B29C44/5609 (EP);
B29C44/60 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/24] | B29C67/22, B29D27/04 | ||
Former IPC [1986/18] | B29C67/22, B29D27/04 | ||
Former IPC [1984/49] | B29D27/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/49] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Polymerschaum | [1984/49] | English: | Improvements in or relating to the production of polymeric foam | [1984/49] | French: | Production de mousses polymériques | [1984/49] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 09.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0044226 ; | [A]DE1292391 ; | [A]FR2458381 ; | [A]US3872199 ; | [A]US4051211 ; | [A]GB2101515 ; | [A]GB1556170 ; | [A]US3833694 ; | [A]US3214793 ; | [A]FR85490E |