EP0129368 - Process and catalyst for polyolefin density and molecular weight control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US | ||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US | ||
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US | ||
Former [1984/52] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ewen, John Alexander 16615 Kentwood Houston Texas / US | 02 /
Welborn, Howard Curtis Jr. 1502 Driscoll Street Houston Texas / US | [1984/52] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1984/52] | Northover, Robert Frank ESSO Chemical Limited Esso Chemical Research Centre P.O. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303805.0 | 05.06.1984 | [1984/52] | Priority number, date | US19830501688 | 06.06.1983 Original published format: US 501688 | [1984/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129368 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129368 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0129368 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/62 | [1984/52] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP);
C08F10/00 (EP);
C08F110/02 (EP);
C08F210/16 (EP);
C08F4/65912 (EP);
C08F4/6592 (EP);
C08F4/65927 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/63922 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/06, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Katalysator um die Dichte und das molekulare Gewicht von Polyolefinen zu kontrollieren | [1984/52] | English: | Process and catalyst for polyolefin density and molecular weight control | [1984/52] | French: | Procédé et catalyseur pour contrôler la densité et le poids moléculaire de polyoléfines | [1984/52] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/52] | 24.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1990
18.06.2001
WITHDRAWN TARGOR GmbH Rheinstr. 4 G 55116 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Lederer, Franz, et al, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | 02
25.04.1990
10.07.1990
ADMISSIBLE Fina Research S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE Opponent's representative Detrait, Jean-Claude Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1990
18.06.2001
WITHDRAWN TARGOR GmbH Rheinstr. 4 G 55116 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Lederer, Franz, et al, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
02
25.04.1990
10.07.1990
ADMISSIBLE Fina Research S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE Opponent's representative Detrait, Jean-Claude c/o Fina Research S.A. Patent Department Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Feluy / BE | |||
Former [1999/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1990
10.07.1990
ADMISSIBLE Targor GmbH Rheinstr. 4G 55119 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al, et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
02
25.04.1990
10.07.1990
ADMISSIBLE Fina Research S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE Opponent's representative Detrait, Jean-Claude c/o Fina Research S.A. Patent Department Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Feluy / BE | |||
Former [1998/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1990
10.07.1990
ADMISSIBLE TARGOR GmbH Rheinstr. 4 G 55116 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Bieller, Vera BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02
25.04.1990
10.07.1990
ADMISSIBLE Fina Research S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE Opponent's representative Detrait, Jean-Claude c/o Fina Research S.A. Patent Department Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Feluy / BE | |||
Former [1996/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1990
10.07.1990
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65903 Frankfurt / DE Opponent's representative Lederer, Franz, et al, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
02
25.04.1990
10.07.1990
ADMISSIBLE Fina Research S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE Opponent's representative Detrait, Jean-Claude c/o Fina Research S.A. Patent Department Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Feluy / BE | |||
Former [1990/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1990
HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65903 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02
25.04.1990
ADMISSIBLE Fina Research S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Feluy / BE Opponent's representative Detrait, Jean-Claude c/o Fina Research S.A. Patent Department Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Feluy / BE | |||
Former [1990/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.1990
HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65903 Frankfurt / DE | 12.07.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.01.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.06.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1992 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.11.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M12) | 15.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.04.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.07.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.07.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.06.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 15.01.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 23.07.1999 | Appeal received No. T0314/99 | 23.11.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.06.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 21.06.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0069951 ; | [XD]EP0035242 ; | [X]US3161629 (GORSICH RICHARD D); | [X]FR2072484 (BAYER AG); | [XD]DE2608933 (BASF AG); | [XD]DE2608863 (BASF AG) | [X] - DIE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, vol. 182, no. 4, April 16, 1981 HEIDELBERG (DE) J. CIHL[R et al.: "Polymerization of Ethylene Catalyzed by Titanocene Systems, 2a, Catalytic Systems CP2 TiRCI/Oxyaluminium Compounds", pages 1127-113 |