EP0137578 - A method of fracturing a subterranean formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.1988 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fitch, John Lawrence 4923 Brookview Drive Dallas Texas 75220 / US | 02 /
Strubar, Malcolm Krabill 1324 Croydon Irving Texas 75062 / US | [1985/16] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John Anthony, et al Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | [1987/11] |
Former [1985/16] | West, Alan Harry Mobil Court 3 Clements Inn London WC2A 2EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 84303816.7 | 06.06.1984 | [1985/16] | Priority number, date | US19830530815 | 09.09.1983 Original published format: US 530815 | [1985/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0137578 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0137578 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/26 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
E21B43/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1985/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Spaltenbildung in einer unterirdischen Formation | [1985/25] | English: | A method of fracturing a subterranean formation | [1985/16] | French: | Procédé pour la fracturation d'une formation souterraine | [1985/25] | File destroyed: | 08.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 23.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 11.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/39] | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1988 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3372752 (PRATER RONALD R); | [A]US3687203 (MALONE WILLIAM T); | [Y]US3851709 (FITCH J, et al); | [A]US3954142 (BROADDUS GENE C, et al); | [Y]US3987855 (MESSENGER JOSEPH U); | [A]US4005750 (SHUCK LOWELL Z); | [A]US4186802 (PERLMAN WILLIAM [US]); | [XP]US4434848 (SMITH MICHAEL B [US]) | [A] - PETROLEUM ENGINEER INTERNATIONAL, vol. 45, no. 11, October 1973, pages 17-20, Dallas, Texas, US; A.A. DANESHY: "Mechanics and direction of hydraulic fracturing" |