EP0130719 - A connector and packaging structure for a semiconductor device employing the connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1990 [1990/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minemura, Tetsuro 1-36-4-506 Nishinarusawa-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Ando, Hisashi 5-16-5 Kanesawa-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Kita, Yoshiaki 3337-128 Nakane Katsuta-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Ikuta, Isao 2-26 Mimaya-cho Uchigou Iwaki-shi Fukushima-ken / JP | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 84304015.5 | 14.06.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | JP19830105652 | 15.06.1983 Original published format: JP 10565283 | [1985/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130719 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130719 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130719 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/70, H01R23/68 | [1986/05] | CPC: |
H05K3/326 (EP,US);
H01R12/82 (EP,US);
H01R12/52 (EP,US);
H01R4/58 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0308 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0397 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1985/02] | H01R4/70 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1989/15] |
Former [1985/02] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Steckverbinder und Verpackungseinrichtung für eine Halbleitervorrichtung, die diesen Steckverbinder benutzt | [1985/02] | English: | A connector and packaging structure for a semiconductor device employing the connector | [1985/02] | French: | Connecteur et structure d'emballage pour un dispositif semi-conducteur utilisant ce connecteur | [1985/02] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1989/46: (deleted) | EPB 1989/46: (deleted) | EPB 1989/46: (deleted) | EPB 1985/02: Ein Berichtigungsantrag nach Regel 88(EPÜ)auf Hinzufügung einer zweiten Priorität, 270783 JP135883 ist am 240984 eingegangen | EPB 1985/02: A request for correction under rule 88(EPC)for the purpose of adding a second priority-claim, 270783 JP135883, has been received on 240984 | EPB 1985/02: Une requête en correction selon la règle 88(CBE)pour l'ajout d'une deuxième priorité, 270783 JP135883, a été reçue en date du 240984 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1984 | Examination requested [1985/02] | 29.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0123376 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [X]US3748108 (ROTHWARF F, et al); | [E]EP0086013 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [A]EP0081372 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [A]US3528173 (GALL ANDREW S); | [AP]GB2130025 (CONTROL DATA CORP) |