EP0131399 - Glass for cathode ray tube faceplate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1991 | Revocation of patent | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORNING GLASS WORKS Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | For all designated states Corning Glass Works Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friesen, Glen Delbert 184 East Third Street Corning New York 14830 / US | [1985/03] | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 84304098.1 | 18.06.1984 | [1985/03] | Priority number, date | US19830512544 | 11.07.1983 Original published format: US 512544 | US19840580617 | 16.02.1984 Original published format: US 580617 | [1985/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0131399 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0131399 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131399 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/087, H01J29/18 | [1985/03] | CPC: |
H01J29/863 (EP);
C03C3/095 (KR);
C03C3/087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1985/03] | Title | German: | Glas für den Schirm von Kathodenstrahlröhren | [1985/03] | English: | Glass for cathode ray tube faceplate | [1985/03] | French: | Verre pour l'écran de tubes cathodiques | [1985/03] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/43] | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.12.1987
11.02.1988
ADMISSIBLE SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB, et al, et al Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.12.1987
11.02.1988
ADMISSIBLE SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte, et al, et al Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1988/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.12.1987
SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Schmitz, Waldemar, Dipl.-Phys., et al, et al Schmitz + Rasper Patentanwälte Lessingstrasse 10 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 09.03.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.09.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.10.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 02.10.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.03.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4337410 (VAN DER GEER JOSEPHUS J, et al); | [AD]US4015966 (WEAVER EDWARD A); | [AD]US4089693 (LA GROUW COENRAAD MARIA, et al); | [A]GB1291346 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB]) |