EP0132299 - Starch-base semipermeable films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.1990 [1990/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the Secretary United States Department of Commerce National Technical Information Service, Office of Government Inventions and Patents, 5285 Port Royal Road Springfield Virginia 22161 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the Secretary United States Department of Commerce National Technical Information Service, Office of Government Inventions and Patents, 5285 Port Royal Road Springfield, Virginia 22161 / US | ||
Former [1985/05] | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA represented by the Secretary U.S. Department of Commerce National Technical Information Service Office of Government Inventions and Patents 5285 Port Royal Road Springfield, Virginia 22161 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westhoff, Richard P. 6500 North Upland Terrace Peoria Illinois 61615 / US | 02 /
Otey, Felix H. 1128 East Tripp Avenue Peoria Illinois 61603 / US | [1985/05] | Representative(s) | Daley, Michael John, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [1985/05] | Application number, filing date | 84304162.5 | 20.06.1984 | [1985/05] | Priority number, date | US19830507191 | 23.06.1983 Original published format: US 507191 | [1985/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132299 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132299 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132299 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/04, C08L3/02 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
B01D67/003 (EP);
B01D67/00113 (US);
B01D71/08 (EP,US);
C08L3/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L3/02, C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08L3/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1985/05] | B01D13/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/05] | Title | German: | Semipermeable Membran auf Stärkebasis | [1985/05] | English: | Starch-base semipermeable films | [1985/05] | French: | Film semi-perméable à base d'amidon | [1985/05] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3992496 (MATSUNAGA HIROOMI, et al); | [A]DE2718210 (STALEY MFG CO A E); | [A]US4133784 (OTEY FELIX H, et al); | [A]US4156664 (ELMQUIST LYLE F [US], et al); | [A]EP0032802 (US AGRICULTURE [US]) | [A] - INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY, PRODUCT RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, vol. 19, 1980, pages 592-595; F.H. OTEY et al.: "Starch-Based Blown Films" |