EP0130825 - Method and apparatus for sensing sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.1989 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De La Rue SYSTEMS LIMITED De la Rue House 3/5 Burlington Gardens London W1A 1DL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states DE LA RUE SYSTEMS LIMITED De la Rue House 3/5 Burlington Gardens London W1A 1DL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lane, Martin 15 Liddiards Way Purbrook Portsmouth Hants / GB | 02 /
Croset, Michael Roger 2 St. Johns Avenue Purbrook Portsmouth Hants / GB | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 84304492.6 | 29.06.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | GB19830020149 | 26.07.1983 Original published format: GB 8320149 | GB19830017896 | 01.07.1983 Original published format: GB 8317896 | [1985/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130825 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130825 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130825 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65H7/14 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
B65H43/08 (EP,US);
B65H7/12 (EP,US);
B65H2404/14 (EP,US);
B65H2511/17 (EP,US);
B65H2511/524 (EP,US);
B65H2553/412 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1912 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/17, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/11 (EP,US);
B65H2511/524, B65H2220/03 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bogenerfassung | [1985/02] | English: | Method and apparatus for sensing sheets | [1985/02] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection de feuilles | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 11.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 04.01.1989 | LI | 04.01.1989 | [1990/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2419630 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]GB2055766 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH); | [A]GB2059927 (DIEBOLD INC); | [X]WO8101827 (NCR CO [US]); | [X]WO8201698 (DE LA RUE SYST [GB], et al); | [X]DE3200364 (RICOH KK [JP]) |