EP0135991 - Surgically implantable hydrocephalus valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.1986 [1986/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barr, Richard Henry Howard Shaldon Road Newton Abbot Devon, TQ12 4SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | For all designated states Barr, Richard Henry Howard Shaldon Road Newton Abbot Devon, TQ12 4SQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/14] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 84304636.8 | 06.07.1984 | [1985/14] | Priority number, date | GB19830018325 | 06.07.1983 Original published format: GB 8318325 | [1985/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0135991 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [1985/14] | CPC: |
F16K15/044 (EP);
A61M27/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/14] | Title | German: | Chirurgisch implantierbares Hydrocephalus-Ventil | [1985/14] | English: | Surgically implantable hydrocephalus valve | [1985/14] | French: | Valve de l'hydrocéphalus implantable chirurgicalement | [1985/14] | File destroyed: | 14.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/24] | 14.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1500458 [ ]; | US4387715 [ ]; | GB1553485 [ ] | [A] - CATALOGUE, FA. CORDIS; Erkrath, BRD, November 1982"Neurochirurgische Produkte" pages 1-4 |