EP0133781 - Method and apparatus for mobile phase ion chromatography and membrane suppression [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIONEX CORPORATION 1228 Titan Way Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/10] | For all designated states DIONEX CORPORATION 1228 Titan Way Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slingsby, Rosanne Williamson 5144 Greentree Court Pleasanton California 84566 / US | 02 /
Pohl, Christopher Andrew 326 Burke Drive Hayward California 94544 / US | [1985/10] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/10] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305120.2 | 27.07.1984 | [1985/10] | Priority number, date | US19830522828 | 12.08.1983 Original published format: US 522828 | [1985/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0133781 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/46 | [1985/10] | CPC: |
G01N30/96 (EP);
G01N2030/965 (EP);
G01N30/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G01N30/02, B01D15/366 (EP);
G01N30/02, B01D15/367 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ionenchromatographie in mobiler Phase und Membran-Unterdrückung | [1985/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for mobile phase ion chromatography and membrane suppression | [1985/10] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour chromatographie d'ions en phase mobile et suppression par membrane | [1985/10] | File destroyed: | 27.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 17.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/39] | 28.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/43] | 11.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0032770 ; | [AD]US4265634 ; | [A]EP0038720 |