EP0134107 - Method of producing a water-in-oil emulsion explosive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON OIL AND FATS COMPANY, LIMITED 10-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/11] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL AND FATS COMPANY, LIMITED 10-1, Yuraku-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsui, Fumio 11-24, Seishiro-Cho 2-Chome Handa City Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Hiroshi 123-1, Aza-Mukaedo Taketoyo-Cho Chita-Gun Aichi Pref. / JP | 03 /
Aono, Shin 140-2, Aza-Hirai Ohaza-Futsuto Mihama-Cho Chita-Gun Aichi Pref / JP | 04 /
Hattori, Katsuhide 2-35, Kusunoki Taketoyo-Cho Chita-Gun Aichi Pref. / JP | 05 /
Kakino, Shigeru 16-21, Aza-Higashikanakuso Safuri Chita City Aichi Pref. / JP | [1985/11] | Representative(s) | Sheader, Brian Norman, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/11] | Sheader, Brian N., et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305187.1 | 30.07.1984 | [1985/11] | Priority number, date | JP19830140924 | 01.08.1983 Original published format: JP 14092483 | [1985/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0134107 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134107 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C06B21/00, C06B45/00, B01F11/00 | [1985/11] | CPC: |
C06B21/0008 (EP,US);
B01F27/50 (EP,US);
B01F23/41 (EP,US);
B01F23/43 (EP,US);
B01F23/49 (EP,US);
C06B47/145 (EP,US);
B01F27/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Wasser-in-Öl-Emulsion-Sprengstoffs | [1985/11] | English: | Method of producing a water-in-oil emulsion explosive | [1985/11] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'un explosif à base d'une émulsion eau dans huile | [1985/11] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/22] | 12.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1393950 (NIPPON DYEING MACHINE MFG CO); | [YD]US4138281 (OLNEY ROBERT S, et al); | [APD]US4410378 (HATTORI KATSUHIDE [JP], et al) |