EP0133797 - Valve testing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1989 [1989/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greenwood Moore Limited Castle Works Audley Avenue Newport Shropshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/10] | For all designated states Greenwood Moore Limited Castle Works Audley Avenue Newport Shropshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenhalf, Edward John 20 Golf Links Lane Wellington Shropshire / GB | [1985/10] | Representative(s) | Carpenter, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/10] | Carpenter, David, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305252.3 | 02.08.1984 | [1985/10] | Priority number, date | GB19830021751 | 12.08.1983 Original published format: GB 8321751 | [1985/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0133797 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0133797 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0133797 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/06 | [1985/10] | CPC: |
F16K37/0083 (EP,US);
F16K17/06 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7738 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1988/30] |
Former [1985/10] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Ventilprüfung | [1985/10] | English: | Valve testing | [1985/10] | French: | Essai de soupape | [1985/10] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 12.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 12.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0007769 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [A]GB2041171 (BIRKETT LTD SAMUEL); | [A]EP0028661 (FURMANITE INT LTD); | [A]US3269170 (SEBRING EDWARD H, et al); | [A]US2952151 (SIMONSON HOWARD E, et al); | [A]US2419293 (SIMONSON HOWARD E); | [AD]GB2062812 (FURMANITE INT LTD) |