EP0137617 - A flavoured tablet having a high flavour intensity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Robert K. 90 Sun Valley Way Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [1985/16] | Representative(s) | Jones, Michael Raymond, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | Jones, Michael Raymond, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305322.4 | 06.08.1984 | [1985/16] | Priority number, date | US19830525776 | 23.08.1983 Original published format: US 525776 | [1985/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0137617 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0137617 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/22, A23L1/226, A23G3/00 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
A23G3/36 (EP,US);
A23G3/42 (EP,US);
A23L27/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1985/16] | Title | German: | Aromatische Tablette mit hoher Aromaintensität | [1985/23] | English: | A flavoured tablet having a high flavour intensity | [1985/16] | French: | Comprimé aromatisé ayant un arôme d'intensité élevée | [1985/23] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 27.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [APD]EP0102237 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [AD]US3832473 (SAHAYDAK M); | [A]DE2020982 (SUCREST CORP); | [A]BE662884 ; | [A]US4384005 (MCSWEENEY DANIEL R) |