EP0133808 - Hot isostatic pressing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1987 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.1987 [1987/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18 Wakinohama-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/10] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18 Wakinohama-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Yoichi 9-27 Kusunoki-cho Ashiya Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Takahiko 3-37-4 Kitaochai Suma-ku Kobe / JP | [1985/10] | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/10] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305364.6 | 07.08.1984 | [1985/10] | Priority number, date | JP19830125126U | 11.08.1983 Original published format: JP 12512683 U | [1985/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0133808 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0133808 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B30B12/00, B30B15/34 | [1985/10] | CPC: |
B22F3/15 (EP,US);
B30B11/002 (EP,US);
Y10S425/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1985/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum isostatischen Heisspressen | [1985/10] | English: | Hot isostatic pressing apparatus | [1985/10] | French: | Dispositif pour pressage isostatique à chaud | [1985/10] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 16.08.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 04.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4235592 [ ] (SMITH CHARLES W JR [US], et al); | JPS5027680B [ ]; | DD149485 [ ] (REHN FRIEDMAR, et al); | CH538884 [ ] (ATOMIC ENERGY COMMISSION [US]); | JPS5327683B [ ] |