EP0142220 - Cysteic acid and homocysteic acid analogues of methotrexate and aminopterin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.1987 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA-FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, INC. 44 Binney Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | [1985/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosowsky, Andre 76 Lindbergh Avenue Needham Massachusetts / US | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Moon, Donald Keith, et al BREWER & SON Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | [1986/37] |
Former [1985/21] | Marsh, Roy David Brewer & Son 5-9, Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305511.2 | 13.08.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | US19830529214 | 06.09.1983 Original published format: US 529214 | [1985/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142220 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D475/08, // A61K31/495 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
C07D475/08 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/21] | Title | German: | Cysteinsäure- und Homocysteinsäure-Analoge von Methotrexat und Aminopterin | [1985/21] | English: | Cysteic acid and homocysteic acid analogues of methotrexate and aminopterin | [1985/21] | French: | Analogues d'acide cystéique et d'acide homocystéique du méthotrexate et de l'aminoptérine | [1985/21] | File destroyed: | 27.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 14.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/43] | 06.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/34] | 20.03.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2540274 [ ] (MCPHERSON JAMES F, et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 83, no. 21, November 24, 1975, Columbus, Ohio, USA M. CHAYKOVSKY et al. "Methotrexate analogs" page 42columns 1,2; abstract-no. 172 672a |