EP0135362 - Optical smoke detectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cole, Martin Terence 7 Loxwood Avenue Keysborough, VIC 3173 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | For all designated states COLE, Martin Terence 7 Loxwood Avenue Keysborough, VIC 3173 / AU | ||
Former [1985/13] | For all designated states Cole, Martin Terence 29 Stafford Street Huntingdale Victoria 3166 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/13] | Representative(s) | Westwood, Edgar Bruce, et al STEVENS, HEWLETT & PERKINS 5, Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HZ / GB | [1985/13] | Application number, filing date | 84305514.6 | 13.08.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | AU19830000822 | 12.08.1983 Original published format: AU 82283 | [1985/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135362 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135362 | Date: | 25.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0135362 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/53, G08B17/10 | [1985/13] | CPC: |
G08B17/107 (EP);
G08B17/113 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/13] | Title | German: | Optische Rauchdetektoren | [1985/13] | English: | Optical smoke detectors | [1985/13] | French: | Détecteurs de fumée par voie optique | [1985/13] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 27.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Request for further processing for: | 27.12.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.04.1990 | BE | 11.04.1990 | CH | 11.04.1990 | IT | 11.04.1990 | LI | 11.04.1990 | NL | 11.04.1990 | SE | 11.04.1990 | LU | 31.08.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.04.1990 | |
BE | 11.04.1990 | ||
CH | 11.04.1990 | ||
IT | 11.04.1990 | ||
LI | 11.04.1990 | ||
NL | 11.04.1990 | ||
SE | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/23] | AT | 11.04.1990 | |
BE | 11.04.1990 | ||
CH | 11.04.1990 | ||
LI | 11.04.1990 | ||
NL | 11.04.1990 | ||
SE | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | AT | 11.04.1990 | |
CH | 11.04.1990 | ||
LI | 11.04.1990 | ||
NL | 11.04.1990 | ||
SE | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | CH | 11.04.1990 | |
LI | 11.04.1990 | ||
SE | 11.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/46] | CH | 11.04.1990 | |
LI | 11.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2348502 ; | [A]FR2334097 ; | [A]US2812686 ; | [A]DE2624977 ; | [A]FR2503329 ; | [A]DE1797079 |