EP0136037 - Container with integral toggle closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McSherry, Thomas William 61-4 Seaview Avenue Stamford Connecticut 06902 / US | For all designated states Garfield, Nathaniel Henry Sunset Lane Harrison New York 10528 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | For all designated states McSherry, Thomas William 61-4 Seaview Avenue Stamford Connecticut 06902 / US | ||
For all designated states Garfield, Nathaniel Henry Sunset Lane Harrison New York 10528 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McSherry, Thomas William 61-4 Seaview Avenue Stamford Connecticut / US | [1985/14] | Representative(s) | McCallum, William Potter, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | McCallum, William Potter, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305576.5 | 17.08.1984 | [1985/14] | Priority number, date | US19830524241 | 18.08.1983 Original published format: US 524241 | [1985/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136037 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136037 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136037 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/10, B65D3/20, B65D5/02 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
B65D5/02 (EP,US);
B65D5/00 (KR);
B65D3/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/14] | B65D77/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/14] | Title | German: | Behälter mit kniegelenkförmigem Verschluss | [1985/14] | English: | Container with integral toggle closure | [1985/14] | French: | Récipient à fermeture intégrale du type à genouillère | [1985/14] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 24.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 03.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1989 | BE | 27.12.1989 | CH | 27.12.1989 | FR | 27.12.1989 | IT | 27.12.1989 | LI | 27.12.1989 | NL | 27.12.1989 | SE | 27.12.1989 | LU | 31.08.1990 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 27.12.1989 | |
BE | 27.12.1989 | ||
CH | 27.12.1989 | ||
IT | 27.12.1989 | ||
LI | 27.12.1989 | ||
NL | 27.12.1989 | ||
SE | 27.12.1989 | ||
LU | 31.08.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.12.1989 | |
BE | 27.12.1989 | ||
CH | 27.12.1989 | ||
IT | 27.12.1989 | ||
LI | 27.12.1989 | ||
NL | 27.12.1989 | ||
SE | 27.12.1989 | ||
Former [1991/15] | AT | 27.12.1989 | |
BE | 27.12.1989 | ||
CH | 27.12.1989 | ||
LI | 27.12.1989 | ||
NL | 27.12.1989 | ||
SE | 27.12.1989 | ||
Former [1990/52] | AT | 27.12.1989 | |
CH | 27.12.1989 | ||
LI | 27.12.1989 | ||
NL | 27.12.1989 | ||
SE | 27.12.1989 | ||
Former [1990/43] | CH | 27.12.1989 | |
LI | 27.12.1989 | ||
NL | 27.12.1989 | ||
SE | 27.12.1989 | ||
Former [1990/34] | CH | 27.12.1989 | |
LI | 27.12.1989 | ||
SE | 27.12.1989 | ||
Former [1990/31] | CH | 27.12.1989 | |
LI | 27.12.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1011543 (BOEHLEN FRERES S P R L); | [X]GB1118418 (METAL BOX CO LTD); | [X]FR2278583 (FLAX V [FR]); | [X]DE2750740 (ENSO GUTZEIT OY) |