EP0136809 - Polyphase assembly for controlling A.C. devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEN-GURION UNIVERSITY OF THE NEGEV RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY P.O. Box 1025 Beer-Sheva / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states BEN-GURION UNIVERSITY OF THE NEGEV RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY P.O. Box 1025 Beer-Sheva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krichevsky, Mendel 36/11 B'nai Or Street Beer Sheva / IL | 02 /
Rabinovici, Raul 28/19 Rachavat Tsfat Beer Sheva / IL | 03 /
Sharir, Benjamin 15/9 Yehonatan Street Ramat Gan / IL | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 84305797.7 | 24.08.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | IL19760000696 | 07.09.1983 Original published format: IL 69676 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0136809 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136809 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01F37/00 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
H01F37/00 (EP,US);
H01F2029/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/15] | Title | German: | Mehrphasenanordnung zur Steuerung von Wechselstromvorrichtungen | [1985/25] | English: | Polyphase assembly for controlling A.C. devices | [1985/15] | French: | Montage polyphasé pour la commande de dispositifs à courant alternatif | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/50] | 03.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57117216 ; | [A]FR479748 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [FR]); | [A]FR2024029 (HUTTLER EDMOND); | [A]DE2038849 (ELEKTROPROJEKT ANLAGENBAU VEB); | [A]FR2122410 (VISZEK VILLAMOSIPARI [HU]); | [A]GB1322433 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]GB1331748 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]GB1484523 (UNIV BEN GURION); | [A]GB2075271 (ADWEL LTD) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 211(E-137)(1089), 23rd October 1982; & JP - A - 57 117 216 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 21-07-1982, & JP57117216 A 00000000 |