EP0138378 - Synchromesh clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1988 [1988/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.I. Case Europe Limited Cardrew Industrial Estate Redruth Cornwall TR15 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | For all designated states J.I. Case Europe Limited Cardrew Industrial Estate Redruth Cornwall TR15 1ST / GB | ||
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states J.I. Case Europe Limited Meltham Mills Meltham Huddersfield West Yorkshire HD7 3 AR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, Brian Old Tupton, Bradshaw Lane Bradshaw, Halifax, West Yorkshire / GB | 02 /
Standing, Bryan Neil Mavendale 34b Rowley Lane Lepton Huddersfield West Yorkshire / GB | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Norcliffe, Kenneth Adrian Patents & Trade Marks Department Case Tractors Formerly David Brown Tractors Limited Meltham Huddersfield, West Yorkshire HD7 3AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | Norcliffe, Kenneth Adrian Patents & Trade Marks Department Case Tractors formerly David Brown Tractors Limited Meltham Huddersfield, HD7 3AR West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306221.7 | 12.09.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | GB19830025426 | 22.09.1983 Original published format: GB 8325426 | GB19840005299 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: GB 8405299 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0138378 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138378 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/06 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
F16D23/0606 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/17] | Title | German: | Synchronkupplung | [1985/17] | English: | Synchromesh clutch | [1985/17] | French: | Embrayage à synchro | [1985/17] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/48] | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB1280299 ; | [Y]US3419120 ; | [A]FR1098083 ; | [A]FR2466668 |