EP0145150 - Lubricating agents for processing synthetic yarns and method of processing synthetic yarns therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.06.1992 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takemoto Yushi Kabushiki Kaisha 2-5, Minato-machi Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states Takemoto Yushi Kabushiki Kaisha 2-5, Minato-machi Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Hisao 25-3 aza-Kitakawago, ooaza-Ookusa, Kouda-cho Nukata-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Fumihiko 20-12 Matsubara-cho Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Ogiso, Osamu 4-20 Miyanari-machi Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1988/02] |
Former [1985/36] | 01 /
Yamamoto, Hisao 25-3 aza-Kitakawago, ooaza-Ookusa, Kouda-cho Aichi-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kimura, Fumihiko 20-12 Matsubara-cho Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Ogiso, Osamu 4-20 Miyanari-machi Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
Former [1985/25] | 01 /
Yamamoto, Hisao 20-12 Matsubara-cho Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kimura, Fumihiko 20-12 Matsubara-cho Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Ogiso, Osamu 4-20 Miyanari-machi Gamagouri-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Ablewhite, Alan James, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | Ablewhite, Alan James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306559.0 | 26.09.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | JP19830187627 | 06.10.1983 Original published format: JP 18762783 | JP19840005199 | 14.01.1984 Original published format: JP 519984 | JP19840005231 | 13.01.1984 Original published format: JP 523184 | [1985/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0145150 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0145150 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145150 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0145150 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/647, D06M15/53, C08L83/10 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
D06M15/647 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/02] | D06M15/647, C08L83/04, C08L83/10 | ||
Former IPC [1985/25] | D06M15/643, C08L83/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/25] | Title | German: | Schmiermittel zur Behandlung von synthetischen Garnen und Verfahren zum Behandeln dieser synthetischen Garne mit denselben | [1985/25] | English: | Lubricating agents for processing synthetic yarns and method of processing synthetic yarns therewith | [1985/25] | French: | Agents lubrifiants pour le traitement de fils synthétiques et méthode de traitement de fils synthétiques avec ces produits | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 14.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.10.1988
24.11.1988
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65903 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.10.1988
24.11.1988
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65903 Frankfurt / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 28.11.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.04.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.04.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.12.1989 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.11.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.11.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.05.1992 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 06.02.1990 | Appeal received No. T0097/90 | 26.04.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.11.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form | 13.11.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.1991 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3234252 [ ] (PATER ANTON S); | US3562786 [ ] (BAILEY DONALD L, et al); | GB1371956 [ ] (DOW CORNING); | JPS5059551 [ ]; | EP0024375 [ ] | by applicant | JPS4817517 | JPS4427518B | JPS485309 | JPS4930621 | JPS5053695 | JPS5059551 | JPS5167415 | JPS5296297 | JPS5319500 | JPS5343239 | JPS5455 | JPS5567075 | JPS55137273 | JPS5631077 | JPS5812391 |