EP0136915 - Area weapon simulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE MARCONI COMPANY LIMITED The Grove Warren Lane Stanmore Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states THE MARCONI COMPANY LIMITED The Grove Warren Lane Stanmore Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davies, William Brian 15 Oakhanger Close Hook Hampshire / GB | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Keppler, William Patrick The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1985/15] | Application number, filing date | 84306737.2 | 03.10.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | GB19830026583 | 05.10.1983 Original published format: GB 8326583 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136915 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136915 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F41G3/26 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
F41G3/2616 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1985/15] | Title | German: | Simulation von flächendeckenden Waffen | [1985/23] | English: | Area weapon simulation | [1985/15] | French: | Simulation de système d'armes de couverture de zone | [1985/23] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 10.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/52] | 26.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/30] | 20.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2418916 ; | [A]US3877157 ; | [A]US3882496 |