EP0142260 - Lawn sprinkler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hozelock-ASL Limited Haddenham Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP17 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | For all designated states Hozelock-ASL Limited Haddenham Aylesbury Buckinghamshire HP17 8JD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caruana, Joseph Felix 4 Fernbank Northop Hall Nr Mold Clwyd North Wales / GB | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Morton, Colin David, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | Morton, Colin David, et al Keith W Nash & Co. Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306886.7 | 09.10.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | GB19830027423 | 13.10.1983 Original published format: GB 8327423 | GB19830031049 | 21.11.1983 Original published format: GB 8331049 | [1985/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142260 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142260 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B05B3/04 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
B05B3/0486 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/21] | B05B3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/21] | Title | German: | Rasensprenger | [1985/21] | English: | Lawn sprinkler | [1985/21] | French: | Arroseur | [1985/21] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 03.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.1987 | BE | 15.07.1987 | CH | 15.07.1987 | LI | 15.07.1987 | NL | 15.07.1987 | SE | 31.07.1987 | LU | 31.10.1987 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/24] | AT | 15.07.1987 | |
BE | 15.07.1987 | ||
CH | 15.07.1987 | ||
LI | 15.07.1987 | ||
NL | 15.07.1987 | ||
SE | 31.07.1987 | ||
Former [1989/19] | AT | 15.07.1987 | |
BE | 15.07.1987 | ||
NL | 15.07.1987 | ||
SE | 31.07.1987 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 15.07.1987 | |
BE | 15.07.1987 | ||
NL | 15.07.1987 | ||
Former [1989/04] | BE | 15.07.1987 | |
NL | 15.07.1987 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 15.07.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | US1831540 [ ] (NELSON LEWEN R); | AT167364B [ ] (WANKE KARL GEORG); | EP0010925 [ ] (ADVANCED IRRIGATION TECH [IL]) |