EP0138579 - Signal processor for matrix arrays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE SYSTEMS plc Company House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | ||
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whinray, David Thomas British Aerospace PLC Manor Road Hatfield Hertfordshire, AL10 9LL / GB | 02 /
Tilsley, Gwilym John Britsh Aerospace PLC Manor Road Hatfield Hertfordshire, AL10 9LL / GB | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Saul, David Jonathan, et al British Aerospace plc Corporate IPR Department, Headquarters P.O. Box 87 Building Q191 Royal Aerospace Establishment Farnborough Hants GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | Saul, David Jonathan, et al British Aerospace plc Corporate IPR Department, Headquarters P.O. Box 87 Building Q191 Royal Aerospace Establishment Farnborough Hants GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306939.4 | 11.10.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | GB19830027594 | 14.10.1983 Original published format: GB 8327594 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0138579 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0138579 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138579 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/33, H04N5/21 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
H04N25/63 (EP,US);
H04N5/33 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/17] | Title | German: | Signalprozessor für eine photoempfindliche Matrixanordnung | [1985/17] | English: | Signal processor for matrix arrays | [1985/17] | French: | Système de traitement de signal pour un dispositif matriciel photo-sensible | [1985/17] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 12.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0072144 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) |