EP0149302 - Vehicle drivetrain including viscous clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.07.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Motors Corporation 27777 Franklin Road Southfield Michigan 48034 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states American Motors Corporation 27777 Franklin Road Southfield Michigan 48034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Renneker, Dennis N. 3634 Balfour Troy Michigan 48084 / US | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1985/30] | Meeks, Frank Burton Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 47 Marylebone Lane London W1M 6DL / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306980.8 | 12.10.1984 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | US19830545199 | 25.10.1983 Original published format: US 545199 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149302 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149302 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16D35/00, // B60K17/34 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
F16D35/005 (EP,US);
B60K17/351 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19037 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/30] | Title | German: | Fahrzeuggetriebe mit Viskositätskupplung | [1985/30] | English: | Vehicle drivetrain including viscous clutch | [1985/30] | French: | Transmission de véhicule avec accouplement visqueux | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 08.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 14.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/21] | 08.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1988/36] | 22.04.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]GB2139972 (VOLKSWAGEN AG); | [A]GB1475141 (GKN TRANSMISSIONS LTD, et al); | [AD]US4031780 (DOLAN COURTNEY F, et al); | [A]EP0068309 (FERGUSON LTD HARRY [GB]); | [A]FR2515299 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3203707 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [A]WO8404792 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) |